Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/06/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/14/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/21/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 10/07/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 10/13/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 10/27/2011
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 12/01/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 12/01/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 12/01/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 12/14/2011