Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 06/02/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/03/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 06/03/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/14/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/21/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 07/06/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 07/06/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/06/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/18/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 07/19/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 07/21/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 07/22/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 07/26/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/27/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/27/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 07/27/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 07/29/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 08/05/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 09/08/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 09/12/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 09/13/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 09/13/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 09/14/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/14/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/15/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 09/15/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 09/19/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 09/21/2011
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 09/21/2011
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 09/21/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 09/21/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 09/21/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 09/21/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/21/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 09/21/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 09/21/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/21/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 09/21/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 09/21/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/21/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 09/22/2011
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 09/22/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 09/26/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 09/29/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 10/04/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 10/04/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/04/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 10/04/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 10/05/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 10/05/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 10/07/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 10/11/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 10/11/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 10/11/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 10/12/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 10/13/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 10/14/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 10/25/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 10/25/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 10/26/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 10/27/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/27/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 10/27/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/27/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 11/02/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 11/02/2011
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 11/02/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 11/03/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 11/03/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 11/16/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 11/16/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 11/17/2011
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 11/18/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 11/18/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 11/29/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 11/29/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 12/01/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 12/01/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 12/01/2011
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 12/01/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 12/01/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 12/01/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 12/01/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 12/01/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 12/01/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 12/01/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 12/01/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 12/01/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 12/01/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 12/01/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 12/01/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 12/01/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 12/01/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 12/02/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 12/02/2011
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 12/05/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 12/05/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 12/05/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 12/05/2011
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 12/06/2011
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 12/13/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 12/14/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 12/15/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 12/20/2011