Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 05/11/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/11/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 05/11/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/11/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/12/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 05/13/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 05/23/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 07/06/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/11/2011
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 10/14/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/25/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 11/03/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 12/07/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/06/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 01/31/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 09/11/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 09/18/2012
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 11/27/2012
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 12/17/2012