Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/07/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 01/20/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/20/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/20/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 01/20/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 01/20/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 01/20/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 01/26/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 01/26/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 01/26/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 01/26/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 01/26/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 02/09/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 02/09/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 02/09/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/09/2011
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 02/09/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/09/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/09/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 02/09/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/09/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/09/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/09/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 02/09/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/09/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 02/09/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 02/09/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 02/09/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 02/09/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 02/09/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/09/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 02/09/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/09/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/09/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/09/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/09/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 02/09/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/09/2011
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/09/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/09/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/09/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 02/09/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 02/09/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 02/11/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/11/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/11/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 02/11/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/11/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/11/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/11/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/17/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 02/17/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/17/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/17/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 02/17/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/17/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 02/17/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 02/17/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/28/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 02/28/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 02/28/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/28/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 02/28/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 02/28/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 02/28/2011
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 02/28/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/28/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/28/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/03/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/03/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/03/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/03/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/09/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/09/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/09/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/09/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/09/2011
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/09/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 03/09/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/09/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/09/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 03/09/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/11/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 03/11/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/16/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/16/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/16/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/17/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/17/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/17/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/29/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 03/29/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 03/29/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/29/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/29/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 03/30/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 03/31/2011
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 04/01/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 04/04/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/04/2011
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 04/04/2011
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 04/04/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/04/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 04/06/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 04/06/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 04/08/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/08/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/08/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 04/12/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 04/12/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/13/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/13/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/14/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 04/14/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/15/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/15/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/03/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/03/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/03/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/03/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/03/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/03/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/03/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/03/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/03/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 05/03/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 05/03/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/06/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/10/2011
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/10/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 05/23/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/23/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/31/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/15/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/15/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/15/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/06/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 07/12/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/12/2011
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 07/13/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/13/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 07/15/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/19/2011
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/19/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/21/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 07/26/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/07/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/09/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 09/12/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 09/20/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 09/20/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/04/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 10/05/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 10/11/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 10/25/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 10/25/2011
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 11/02/2011
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 11/03/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 11/14/2011
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 11/14/2011
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 11/14/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/15/2011
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 11/18/2011
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 12/02/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 12/12/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/16/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 12/19/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 12/20/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 01/13/2012
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 01/17/2012
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 01/19/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 02/06/2012
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 02/07/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/15/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/28/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 02/28/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 03/05/2012
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 03/19/2012
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/26/2012
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 03/26/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/26/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 04/16/2012
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/16/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/16/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/16/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/16/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 04/23/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 04/23/2012
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/18/2012
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 05/18/2012
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/29/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/12/2012
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/15/2012
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 06/25/2012
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/25/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/25/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/29/2012
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/11/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 07/17/2012
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 07/17/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/17/2012
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-8] 07/25/2012
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 07/30/2012
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 08/02/2012
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 08/02/2012
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 08/02/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/28/2012