Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/13/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/13/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/13/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/24/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/24/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/24/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/24/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/24/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 05/26/2011
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/26/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/26/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/31/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/01/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/01/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/02/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/02/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/03/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/14/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 06/14/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/14/2011
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/14/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/15/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/15/2011
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/15/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/16/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/16/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/16/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/21/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/21/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 06/21/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/24/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 07/06/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/06/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/07/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/11/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/11/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/11/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 07/12/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/13/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/19/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 07/19/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 07/21/2011
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/07/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 09/07/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/07/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/08/2011
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/08/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 09/09/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/14/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 09/15/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/15/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/15/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 09/20/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/23/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 10/03/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 10/05/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 10/05/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 11/15/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 11/17/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 11/17/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 01/23/2012
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 01/23/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 01/31/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 02/29/2012
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 04/17/2012
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 05/10/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/16/2012
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 06/21/2012