Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 05/05/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/10/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/10/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 05/23/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/25/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 05/25/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/25/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/25/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/31/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 05/31/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/31/2011
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/02/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 06/02/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 06/02/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/14/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/14/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 06/15/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/15/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 06/21/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 06/22/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 06/23/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/06/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/06/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/12/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/12/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 07/13/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 07/13/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 07/15/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/19/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 07/19/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/26/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/28/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 08/01/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 08/12/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 09/08/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 09/08/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 09/08/2011
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 09/13/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/13/2011
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/13/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 09/15/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 09/21/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 09/23/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/29/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 10/12/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/14/2011
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 10/14/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 11/01/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 11/01/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 11/02/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 11/16/2011
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 11/17/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 12/05/2011
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 12/05/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 12/06/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 12/06/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 01/23/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 01/31/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 02/13/2012
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 02/24/2012
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 02/28/2012
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 03/01/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/05/2012
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 03/26/2012
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 04/19/2012
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 04/19/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/08/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/07/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/07/2012
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/18/2012
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 06/18/2012
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/18/2012
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/18/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/18/2012
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/19/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 06/21/2012
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 06/27/2012
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 07/19/2012
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/31/2012
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/10/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/10/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/12/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/14/2012