Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/26/2011
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/16/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/12/2011
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 08/12/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 08/19/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 08/30/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 08/30/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 08/30/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/02/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/07/2011
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/07/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/07/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/08/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/08/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 09/08/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/09/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/12/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/12/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/15/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/15/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/21/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/21/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/21/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/22/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/22/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 09/29/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/29/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/29/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 10/03/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/03/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/04/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/04/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 10/05/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/11/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 10/11/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/11/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/11/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 10/12/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 10/12/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/14/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 11/01/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 11/02/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/04/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/04/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 11/14/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 11/14/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/14/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 11/16/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 11/16/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/16/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 11/16/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 11/17/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 11/18/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 11/18/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 12/01/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 12/01/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 12/08/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 12/12/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 12/14/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 12/15/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 12/15/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 12/15/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 12/16/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 12/16/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 12/16/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 12/19/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 12/19/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 12/19/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 12/19/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 12/23/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 01/06/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 01/13/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/13/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 01/13/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 01/13/2012
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 01/13/2012
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/18/2012
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 01/18/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 01/23/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 01/23/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/24/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/02/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 02/14/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 02/14/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/14/2012
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 02/14/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/15/2012
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 02/16/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 02/24/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/24/2012
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 02/24/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/27/2012
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 02/29/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 03/06/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/06/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/26/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/29/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/24/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/25/2012