Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 05/04/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 05/26/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 05/26/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/26/2011
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 05/26/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/01/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/21/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 06/24/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/06/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 07/08/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/19/2011
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/28/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 04/16/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/16/2012