Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large]* 05/02/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 05/02/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/03/2011
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/02/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 06/14/2011
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 06/14/2011
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/21/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/23/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 10/04/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 10/06/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/06/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 02/07/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/07/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/20/2012
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 03/20/2012
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 03/20/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/20/2012
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/20/2012
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/22/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/27/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/27/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 03/27/2012
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/27/2012
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/27/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/27/2012
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/29/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/29/2012
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/25/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/25/2012
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/27/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/27/2012
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 05/16/2012
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/16/2012
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/16/2012
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/16/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/16/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 05/16/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/16/2012
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/18/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/18/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 05/31/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/31/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/31/2012
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/31/2012
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/31/2012
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 05/31/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/31/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/31/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/05/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/07/2012
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 06/07/2012
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/07/2012
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 06/28/2012
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 06/28/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/28/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/28/2012
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/28/2012
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 07/12/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/12/2012
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/19/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/19/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/19/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/19/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/19/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/19/2012
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 07/19/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 07/19/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 07/25/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 08/02/2012
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 08/02/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 08/02/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 08/02/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 08/02/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 09/21/2012
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/21/2012
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 10/02/2012
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/19/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 10/19/2012
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 11/15/2012