Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 04/15/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 04/15/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/15/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 04/15/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/12/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/12/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 05/12/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 05/12/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/12/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/26/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/26/2011
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/26/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/03/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 06/03/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/03/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/03/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/03/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/03/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/16/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/16/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/16/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/16/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/07/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/07/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/07/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/07/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/07/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/07/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/20/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/21/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/21/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/21/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/29/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/29/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/29/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/15/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/15/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 09/15/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 09/15/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/15/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/27/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 10/27/2011
Rep. Hochul, Kathleen C. [D-NY-26] 11/04/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 11/04/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 11/04/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 11/04/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 11/04/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/17/2011
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 11/17/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 11/17/2011
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 11/17/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 12/06/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 12/06/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 12/06/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 12/06/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/06/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 12/06/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 12/16/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 12/16/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 12/19/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 01/25/2012
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 01/25/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 01/25/2012
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/27/2012
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 01/31/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/03/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 02/09/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 02/09/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 02/14/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 02/14/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 02/14/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/14/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/01/2012
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/01/2012
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/08/2012
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/08/2012
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/08/2012
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 03/08/2012
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/08/2012
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/22/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 04/18/2012
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/09/2012
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/09/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/09/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 05/10/2012
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/17/2012
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/17/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 05/31/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/31/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 05/31/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/31/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 06/19/2012
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/19/2012
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 06/19/2012
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/19/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/12/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 07/17/2012
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/25/2012
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 08/02/2012
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 08/02/2012
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-8] 08/02/2012
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/12/2012
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/12/2012
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 09/19/2012