Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 05/02/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 05/02/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/02/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/04/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/04/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/04/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 05/10/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/10/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 05/10/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/23/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/23/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 05/23/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/23/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 05/23/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/07/2011
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 11/01/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 11/01/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 11/29/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 12/16/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 12/20/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 01/24/2012
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 01/31/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 01/31/2012
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 02/08/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/28/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/27/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/17/2012
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/17/2012
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 07/17/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/17/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/17/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/17/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/17/2012
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/17/2012
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 07/17/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/17/2012
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/17/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/17/2012
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/23/2012
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 07/23/2012
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 07/24/2012
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 07/24/2012
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/24/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/24/2012
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 07/24/2012
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 08/01/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 08/01/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 08/01/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 08/02/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 08/02/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/23/2012