Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 02/17/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/07/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/18/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/31/2012