Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 04/15/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/02/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/02/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/02/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/02/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/02/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/02/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/02/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/03/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 05/03/2011
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/04/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/04/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 05/04/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/04/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/04/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 05/04/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/04/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/05/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 05/05/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/05/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 05/10/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 05/10/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/10/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/10/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/10/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/10/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/10/2011
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/10/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/10/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/10/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 05/11/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/11/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/11/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/11/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 05/12/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 05/12/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 05/12/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 05/12/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 05/23/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/23/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 05/23/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 05/24/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/24/2011
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/26/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/31/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/13/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/13/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 06/15/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 06/21/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 06/21/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 06/21/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 06/21/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 06/22/2011
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/23/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 06/23/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 06/23/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/24/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 07/06/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 07/06/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 07/06/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/06/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/06/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 07/07/2011
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 07/08/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 07/12/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 07/13/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 07/15/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/18/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/18/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/19/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/20/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 07/20/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/22/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/22/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 07/25/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 07/26/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 07/27/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/20/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/05/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 10/12/2011
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 11/04/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 11/14/2011
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 11/14/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 11/14/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 02/02/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/03/2012
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 02/15/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/27/2012
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 03/19/2012
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/19/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/17/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/19/2012
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 04/19/2012
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/19/2012
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 04/19/2012
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/19/2012
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 04/24/2012
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/07/2012
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 05/07/2012
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 06/19/2012
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/26/2012

Show cosponsors who withdrew