Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/10/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/10/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/22/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 11/30/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 01/31/2012