Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25]* 04/15/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 04/15/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 04/15/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 04/15/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 05/02/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 05/03/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 05/10/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 06/15/2011
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/08/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 10/03/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 10/04/2011
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 11/16/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 03/28/2012