Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 04/15/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 04/15/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/15/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 04/15/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/04/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 05/04/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 05/05/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 05/23/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 05/23/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/23/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 05/23/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 05/23/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 05/23/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 05/23/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 05/23/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 05/23/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 05/23/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 05/23/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 05/23/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 05/23/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/23/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 05/26/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/26/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 05/26/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 05/26/2011
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 05/26/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 05/26/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 05/31/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/02/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/02/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 06/02/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/02/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 06/02/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/02/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/02/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 06/14/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 06/16/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 06/21/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/21/2011