Refine your search

Date Major Actions
12/31/2011 Became Public Law No: 112-81.
12/31/2011 Signed by President.
12/21/2011 Presented to President.
12/15/2011 Conference report agreed to in Senate: Senate agreed to conference report by Yea-Nay Vote. 86 - 13. Record Vote Number: 230.
12/14/2011 Conference report agreed to in House: On agreeing to the conference report Agreed to by recorded vote: 283 - 136 (Roll no. 932).
12/12/2011 Conference report filed: Conference report H. Rept. 112-329 filed. Filed late, pursuant to previous special order.(text of conference report: CR H8356-8726)
12/12/2011 Conference committee actions: Conferees agreed to file conference report.
12/01/2011 To conference: Senate insists on its amendment, asks for a conference, appoints conferees Levin; Lieberman; Reed; Akaka; Nelson NE; Webb; McCaskill; Udall CO; Hagan; Begich; Manchin; Shaheen; Gillibrand; Blumenthal; McCain; Inhofe; Sessions; Chambliss; Wicker; Brown MA; Portman; Ayotte; Collins; Graham; Cornyn; Vitter.(consideration: CR S8138)
12/01/2011 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR 12/5/2011 S8187-8341)
12/01/2011 Senate Committee on Armed Services discharged by Unanimous Consent.
05/26/2011 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 322 - 96 (Roll no. 375).
05/23/2011 Supplemental report filed by the Committee on Armed Services, H. Rept. 112-78, Part II.
05/17/2011 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Armed Services. H. Rept. 112-78.
04/14/2011 Introduced in House