Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 01/05/2011
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 01/19/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/19/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 01/19/2011
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 01/19/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 01/19/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 01/19/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 01/19/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 01/19/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 01/19/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 01/19/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 01/19/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 01/19/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 01/19/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 01/24/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 01/24/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 01/24/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 01/24/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 01/24/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 01/25/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 01/25/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/25/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/26/2011
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 01/26/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 02/08/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 02/08/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 02/08/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 02/08/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 02/10/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/10/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/10/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 02/11/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 03/02/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 03/03/2011
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 03/03/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 03/08/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 03/08/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 03/11/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 03/11/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 03/16/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 05/26/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 06/01/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 01/24/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 08/01/2012