Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/04/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/04/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/05/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/05/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/10/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/10/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/10/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/10/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/10/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/10/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/11/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/12/2011
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 05/26/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 05/26/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/01/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/03/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/13/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/15/2011
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 06/15/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 06/21/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/11/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/12/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 08/01/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/08/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/14/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/02/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 11/02/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 11/02/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/02/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/18/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 12/20/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 01/24/2012
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/09/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 03/28/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/09/2012