Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/14/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/14/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/15/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/02/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/02/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/02/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/02/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/02/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/13/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/13/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/13/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/24/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/24/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/01/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/02/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/13/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/21/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/06/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/06/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 07/06/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/06/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/14/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/15/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/18/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 08/05/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/07/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 09/15/2011
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 06/28/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/25/2012
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 12/17/2012