Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Reported to House without amendment, Part I (12/08/2011)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Authorizes the admission of an alien as an immigrant to the Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands (Commonwealth) who is admissible to the United States, resided in the Commonwealth on November 28, 2009, and continues to so reside on the date of enactment of this Act, if such alien: (1) was born in the Commonwealth between January 1, 1974, and January 9, 1978; (2) was, on May 8, 2008, a Commonwealth permanent resident; (3) is the spouse or child of an alien described in clause 1 or clause 2 above; or (4) was on May 8, 2008, and continues to be, an immediate relative of a U.S. citizen (not withstanding the citizen's age).

Prohibits, unless otherwise authorized, such alien from traveling to, or residing in, any part of the United States other than the Commonwealth.

Authorizes such an alien (other than an immediate relative) to apply for an immigrant visa or to adjust his or her status to that of an alien lawfully admitted for permanent residence on or after January 1, 2015, and before January 1, 2016. Reduces the number of diversity immigrants for each such immigrant visa or permanent resident status granted.