Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/13/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/13/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/13/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/13/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/13/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/13/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/13/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/13/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/15/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/15/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/10/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/10/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/10/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/10/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/01/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/01/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/01/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/01/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 06/03/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/03/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/03/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/13/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/13/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 06/13/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/13/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/13/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 06/13/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/13/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/16/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/16/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 06/16/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/16/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/23/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/23/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/23/2011
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/23/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/24/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/07/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/07/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 07/07/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 07/12/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/14/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/21/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/21/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 07/21/2011
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/21/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/21/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/26/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/26/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/26/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/26/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 08/01/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 08/01/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 08/01/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 08/01/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 08/01/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 09/09/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/09/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/09/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 09/09/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 09/09/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/09/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 09/09/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/09/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/15/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/15/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/15/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/23/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 09/23/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 09/23/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 09/23/2011
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/23/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 10/05/2011
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 10/05/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/05/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 10/05/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/24/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 10/24/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 10/24/2011
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 10/24/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 10/25/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 11/02/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/14/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 11/17/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 11/17/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 11/17/2011
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 11/18/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/29/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 11/29/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 11/30/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/30/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 12/07/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 12/13/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 12/13/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 12/13/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 12/14/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 12/20/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 01/24/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 02/09/2012
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 02/21/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/28/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/01/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/16/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 04/16/2012
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/19/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/27/2012
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/08/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/08/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/16/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/16/2012
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/05/2012
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/05/2012
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/20/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/19/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/19/2012
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/24/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 09/12/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/14/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/20/2012
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/21/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/13/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 12/18/2012
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 12/19/2012