Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/12/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/10/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 02/29/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/20/2012