Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/25/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 11/25/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 11/25/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/07/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/07/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/07/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/21/2012
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/16/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/15/2012
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/16/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/11/2012