Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 03/21/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 03/21/2012
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/21/2012
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 03/21/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 03/21/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 03/21/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/22/2012
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/22/2012
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/22/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/22/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/22/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/22/2012
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 03/22/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/22/2012
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 03/22/2012
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 03/22/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/22/2012
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/22/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/22/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 03/22/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 03/26/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 03/26/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/26/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 03/26/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/26/2012
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 03/26/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/26/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 03/26/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/26/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/27/2012
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/27/2012
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 03/27/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/28/2012
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/28/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/29/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/07/2012