Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/07/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/08/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/08/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 05/02/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/02/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/01/2012
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/08/2012