Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 04/08/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/15/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/31/2011
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 05/07/2012