Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 04/06/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/06/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 04/06/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 04/06/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/06/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/07/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 04/08/2011
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 04/08/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/08/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/08/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/08/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/11/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/11/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/11/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/15/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 04/15/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 04/15/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 05/02/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/02/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/02/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/02/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/02/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/03/2011
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/04/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/10/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/10/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/11/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 05/24/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 05/26/2011
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/26/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/31/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/31/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/31/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/31/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/31/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/31/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/15/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/16/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 06/21/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/23/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/14/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/15/2011
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 07/18/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/19/2011
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 07/20/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/25/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 10/03/2011
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 10/25/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 12/12/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 12/12/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 12/12/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 01/31/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/01/2012
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/05/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 05/07/2012
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/08/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/09/2012
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/17/2012
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 07/23/2012
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 09/19/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/20/2012
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 09/20/2012
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-8] 09/21/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 10/02/2012