Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 04/06/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 04/06/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 04/06/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 04/06/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/07/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/07/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 04/07/2011
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 04/07/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 04/07/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/07/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/07/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/07/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/07/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/07/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/07/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/07/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/07/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/07/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/07/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/07/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/07/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/07/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/07/2011
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/07/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/07/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/07/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/07/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/07/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/07/2011
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/07/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/07/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/07/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/07/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/07/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/07/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/07/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/07/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/07/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/07/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/07/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/07/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/07/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/07/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/07/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/07/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/07/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/07/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/07/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/07/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/07/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 04/07/2011
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/07/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/08/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 04/08/2011
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/08/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 04/08/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/12/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/12/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/12/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 04/12/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/12/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/12/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/12/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/12/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/12/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/12/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/12/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 04/12/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/12/2011
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/12/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 04/12/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/12/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/12/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/12/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 04/12/2011
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 04/13/2011
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 04/14/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/14/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/14/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 04/14/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/14/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 04/14/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/14/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/14/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/14/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 04/14/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/14/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 04/14/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/14/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/14/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/15/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 04/15/2011
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 04/15/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 05/02/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/11/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/12/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/12/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/12/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/12/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/13/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/24/2011
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/24/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/03/2011
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 06/13/2011
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/13/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/06/2011
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/22/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 09/12/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 10/31/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 02/03/2012

Show cosponsors who withdrew