Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/05/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/05/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/05/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/08/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/08/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/08/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/08/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/08/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/08/2011
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/08/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/08/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/08/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 04/08/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/08/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/15/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/15/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/15/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/15/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 04/15/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/11/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/11/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/11/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/11/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/31/2011
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/31/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/31/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/31/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/31/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/31/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/31/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/03/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/03/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 06/03/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/22/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/22/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 06/22/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/22/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/22/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/22/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/22/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/22/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/15/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/15/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/15/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/15/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/15/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/15/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/15/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 07/15/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/28/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/28/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 07/28/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 09/13/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 12/07/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 12/07/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 12/20/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 12/20/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 01/17/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/29/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/29/2012
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 02/29/2012
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/29/2012
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 02/29/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 03/29/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 04/26/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/26/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/26/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 05/10/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/10/2012
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/01/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/01/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/01/2012
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/20/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/20/2012
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 06/20/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/20/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 08/02/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 08/02/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/20/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/28/2012