Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/31/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/03/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/22/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/15/2011