Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/08/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/15/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/28/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/01/2012