Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 04/05/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 04/05/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 04/05/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/07/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 04/08/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 04/12/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 04/12/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/02/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/12/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/12/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/14/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/14/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 06/14/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/14/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/14/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 06/14/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 07/13/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 07/15/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 08/05/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/14/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/14/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/21/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 10/04/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 11/18/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/30/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/30/2012