Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 04/01/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 04/12/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 04/13/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 04/15/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/10/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 07/12/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 07/20/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 08/01/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 08/01/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/07/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 09/08/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 09/14/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/20/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 09/20/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 09/20/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/21/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 09/21/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 09/23/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 09/29/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/29/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/29/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 10/03/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 10/03/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 10/05/2011
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 10/05/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 10/06/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 10/11/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 10/11/2011
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 10/12/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 10/24/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 10/24/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 10/24/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 10/26/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 10/26/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 11/01/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 11/01/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 11/03/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 11/03/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 11/04/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 11/17/2011
Rep. Hochul, Kathleen C. [D-NY-26] 12/16/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 01/31/2012
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 02/03/2012
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 02/03/2012
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 02/07/2012
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/08/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 02/08/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/14/2012
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 02/14/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 02/14/2012
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 02/16/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 02/27/2012
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/28/2012
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 03/07/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 03/07/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/19/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 03/19/2012
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 03/22/2012
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/29/2012
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 05/16/2012
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 05/30/2012
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 06/06/2012
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 07/10/2012
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 07/18/2012