Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 04/04/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/05/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/06/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/06/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 04/06/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/07/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/23/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 07/25/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/12/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 08/01/2012