Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/08/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 04/08/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 04/15/2011
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 05/31/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 11/01/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 05/30/2012
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 06/19/2012