Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 01/12/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 01/12/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 01/12/2011
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 01/12/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 01/12/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 01/12/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 01/12/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 01/12/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 01/12/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 01/12/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 01/12/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 01/12/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 01/12/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/12/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 01/12/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 01/12/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 01/12/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 01/12/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 01/12/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 01/12/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 01/12/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 01/12/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 01/12/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 01/12/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 01/12/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 01/12/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 01/12/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 01/12/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 01/12/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 01/12/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 01/19/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 01/19/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 01/19/2011
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 01/20/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 01/20/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 01/20/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 01/24/2011
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 01/26/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/26/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 01/26/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 01/26/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 01/26/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 01/26/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 01/26/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 01/26/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 01/26/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 01/26/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 01/26/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 01/26/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 02/14/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 03/01/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 03/08/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/30/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 05/11/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 09/07/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/24/2012
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/24/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 07/25/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 07/25/2012
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 07/25/2012
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/31/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 07/31/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 08/01/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 09/21/2012