Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/30/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 03/30/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 03/30/2011
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/21/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/22/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/03/2011
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 11/03/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 02/02/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 02/02/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/02/2012
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 02/28/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/28/2012
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 03/06/2012
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 04/19/2012