Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 03/30/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 03/30/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/02/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/26/2011
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 06/06/2012
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/12/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 09/19/2012