Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 03/30/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/26/2011
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/14/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/06/2012
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 04/19/2012