Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 05/03/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 05/11/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 05/12/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/23/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/26/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 06/13/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/22/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 07/14/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/19/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 09/14/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 10/07/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 10/11/2011