Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/08/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/23/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 05/23/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 06/01/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 06/02/2011
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 06/23/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/14/2011
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/06/2012