Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 05/23/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 06/13/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 06/13/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 06/22/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/06/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 10/04/2011