Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 05/26/2011
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 06/02/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 07/29/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 02/29/2012
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 09/12/2012