Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 04/07/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 04/14/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/15/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 05/03/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 05/23/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/26/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/06/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 12/05/2011
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 01/13/2012
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/19/2012
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 08/01/2012