Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/01/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/26/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/26/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/31/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 06/13/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 06/24/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/06/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 09/19/2012