Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 05/10/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/24/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/02/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/02/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/13/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/06/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 07/06/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/06/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 07/21/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 08/05/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 06/08/2012