Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/02/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 05/11/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/23/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/23/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/25/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 06/15/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/21/2011
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 09/20/2011