Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 03/30/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/05/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 05/10/2011
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 06/03/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 06/15/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/23/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 07/06/2011
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 07/06/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 07/29/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 09/22/2011
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/29/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 12/15/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 03/29/2012
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 06/06/2012