Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 05/23/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/23/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/02/2011
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 09/22/2011
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 10/04/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/29/2012